Global Patent Index - EP 0795183 B1

EP 0795183 B1 2000-06-07 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING EXPLOSIONS AND FIRES IN ELECTRICAL TRANSFORMERS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING EXPLOSIONS AND FIRES IN ELECTRICAL TRANSFORMERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHÜTUNG VON EXPLOSION UND BRAND FÜR ELEKTRISCHE TRANSFORMATOREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PREVENTION CONTRE L'EXPLOSION ET L'INCENDIE DES TRANSFORMATEURS ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 0795183 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96932665 A

Priority

  • FR 9601513 W
  • FR 9511386 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9712379A1] A method for preventing explosions and fires in an electrical transformer (1) with a tank (2) filled with an inflammable coolant (7), wherein a break in the electrical insulation of the transformer (1) is sensed using a pressure sensor means (11), the coolant (7) is partially removed from the tank (2) by means of a valve (15), and the hot portions of the coolant (7) are cooled by injecting a pressurised inert gas (16) into the bottom of the tank (2) to stir up the coolant (7) and expel the adjacent oxygen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/14; H01F 27/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02H 7/04 (2006.01); H01F 27/12 (2006.01); H01F 27/14 (2006.01); H01F 27/40 (2006.01); H02H 5/06 (2006.01); H02H 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/14 (2013.01); H01F 27/402 (2013.01); H01F 2027/406 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9712379 A1 19970403; AT 193784 T 20000615; BG 101451 A 19971128; BG 63740 B1 20021031; CA 2206793 A1 19970403; CA 2206793 C 20110920; CN 1079573 C 20020220; CN 1165581 A 19971119; CZ 293859 B6 20040818; CZ 9701532 A3 19981216; DE 69608784 D1 20000713; DE 69608784 T2 20010201; DE 69608784 T9 20120329; DE 795183 T1 19980115; DK 0795183 T3 20001002; EP 0795183 A1 19970917; EP 0795183 B1 20000607; ES 2148795 T3 20001016; FR 2739486 A1 19970404; FR 2739486 B1 19971114; GR 3034274 T3 20001229; HK 1003400 A1 20020705; HU 221222 B1 20020828; HU 9800461 A2 19980629; HU 9800461 A3 20000328; JP H10510105 A 19980929; KR 100441193 B1 20041103; MX 9703595 A 19970830; PT 795183 E 20001130; RO 116688 B1 20010430; RU 2215352 C2 20031027; SK 284150 B6 20041005; SK 64597 A3 19971008; UA 45365 C2 20020415; US 5946171 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150928

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161005

2017-02-02 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20000401961

- Effective date: 20160928

2016-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150927

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150927

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150927

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-06-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-06-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150928

2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150927

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160328

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150927

2016-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 193784 T

- Effective date: 20150927

2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-04-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150927

2016-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150927

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-04-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160328

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608784

2015-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-12-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20141001

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20140912

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-26 [REG FR AU] OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE OWNERSHIP OR EXPLOITATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT

- Effective date: 20120912

2012-10-19 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

- Name of requester: SERGI TRANSFORMER EXPLOSION PREVENTION TECHNOL, IN

- Effective date: 20120918

2005-06-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-03-23 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: VA TECH HYDRO GMBH & CO

2003-12-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VA TECH HYDRO GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 20010227

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: VA TECH HYDRO GMBH & CO

2003-10-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VA TECH HYDRO GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 20010227

2003-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: VA TECH HYDRO GMBH & CO

2003-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VA TECH HYDRO GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 20010227

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: VA TEC HYDRO GMBH & CO

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: VA TECH PATENTE GMBH

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: VA TEC HYDRO GMBH & CO

2001-06-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VA TECH PATENTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-05-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VA TEC HYDRO GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-04-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VA TEC HYDRO GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 20010227

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148795 T3

2000-10-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608784 20000713

2000-07-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193784 T 20000615

1998-01-15 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971118

1997-10-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970526

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE