Global Patent Index - EP 0795207 B1

EP 0795207 B1 2000-04-26 - HIGH-FREQUENCY SWITCHING DISTRIBUTOR

Title (en)

HIGH-FREQUENCY SWITCHING DISTRIBUTOR

Title (de)

HOCHFREQUENZSCHALTVERTEILER

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR DE COMMUTATION HAUTE FREQUENCE

Publication

EP 0795207 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96927657 A

Priority

  • DE 19531951 A
  • EP 9603404 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19531951C1] To improve a high-frequency switching distributor by giving it the simplest possible structure and absence of transpositions, the switching distributor has at least two distributor circuits arranged on at least one circuit board, each of the two distributor circuits is arranged in one of at least two superimposed planes, each of the distributor circuits has a first terminal, a line connected to the first terminal, a branching circuit branching into N branch lines with a switch in each of the N branch lines, and N second terminals, and each of the N second terminals of one distributor circuit is connected to one of the N second terminals of the other distributor circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19531951 C1 19970206; AU 6741296 A 19970319; EP 0795207 A1 19970917; EP 0795207 B1 20000426; US 5834990 A 19981110; WO 9708771 A1 19970306

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020802

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-08-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010621

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010516

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605048 20000531

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981221

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970528

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT