Global Patent Index - EP 0795348 B1

EP 0795348 B1 2000-09-06 - In-line skate having a brake

Title (en)

In-line skate having a brake

Title (de)

Einspuriger Rollschuh mit Bremse

Title (fr)

Patin à roulettes en ligne équipé d'un frein

Publication

EP 0795348 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97810103 A

Priority

FR 9603245 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795348A1] The roller blade comprises three in line rollers (5,6,9), carried by a main chassis (1). A rear wheel (10) is mounted on an auxiliary chassis (8) pivoted on the main chassis. A pair of rotating discs (13) have truncated faces applied to the rear wheels (6,10) during rearward tipping of the skate. Braking is then assured by the rubbing of these discs on the non-rotating parts of the roller blade. The auxiliary chassis is pivoted about the axis (7) of the main chassis last wheel. Mechanical connection between the main chassis axis (12) and the auxiliary chassis is constituted by a slots (11) in the auxiliary chassis. The disc spindles are engaged in the slots (15) of the main chassis, transverse to the auxiliary chassis slots.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/06 (2006.01); A63C 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/062 (2013.01); A63C 17/065 (2013.01); A63C 17/1409 (2013.01); A63C 2017/1463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795348 A1 19970917; EP 0795348 B1 20000906; DE 69702995 D1 20001012; DE 69702995 T2 20010208; FR 2745724 A1 19970912; FR 2745724 B1 19980507; US 5927728 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050226

2004-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000906

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-11-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702995 20001012

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2000-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991109

1999-11-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IN-LINE SKATE HAVING A BRAKE

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980223

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI