Global Patent Index - EP 0795349 B1

EP 0795349 B1 2001-12-05 - Device and process for evaporating a liquid

Title (en)

Device and process for evaporating a liquid

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Verdampfen einer Flüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour l'évaporation d'un liquide

Publication

EP 0795349 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107773 A

Priority

DE 19605500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19605500C1] An assembly to evaporate a liquid has a first (7) and a second (9) heat exchanger both of which incorporate evaporation passages (15) and further passages (16) holding the heating fluid. The first evaporator (7) is a falling film evaporator which incorporates means (13, 14) by which hot fluid is introduced and discharged. The second evaporator (9) is a liquid bath evaporator incorporating means by which heating fluid is introduced. The novelty is that the flow of heating fluid discharged from the first heat exchanger (7) is discharged to the second heat exchanger (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 1/26; F25J 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 9/02 (2006.01); F25J 3/00 (2006.01); F25J 3/04 (2006.01); F28D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 5/005 (2013.01); F25J 2250/02 (2013.01); F25J 2250/04 (2013.01); F25J 2250/10 (2013.01); Y10S 62/903 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19605500 C1 19970417; CN 1082824 C 20020417; CN 1161874 A 19971015; EP 0795349 A1 19970917; EP 0795349 B1 20011205; JP H09273699 A 19971021; US 5901574 A 19990511

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDE A.G.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030515

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020515

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020508

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608371 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001123

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980220

1997-10-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB