Global Patent Index - EP 0795353 B1

EP 0795353 B1 2000-12-20 - Document shredder

Title (en)

Document shredder

Title (de)

Schriftgutvernichter

Title (fr)

Déchiqueteur de documents

Publication

EP 0795353 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102396 A

Priority

DE 19610048 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795353A1] The shredder has cutting rollers (16) with meshing cutting discs (19), and strippers projecting into the spaces between the discs. Modular stripper units (28, 29) with strippers and longitudinal connectors are located separately of the appliance housing, and extend over a considerable part of the cutting roller concerned. Each stripper engages around a cutting roller by more than 180 degrees . Each has pref. two circumferentially opposite acutely angled stripper edges. These act with the base between the cutter discs. Each cutting roller has at least two stripper elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/00; B02C 18/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/00 (2006.01); B02C 18/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/0007 (2013.01); B02C 18/182 (2013.01); B02C 2018/0069 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795353 A1 19970917; EP 0795353 B1 20001220; DE 19610048 A1 19970918; US 5934580 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150214

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150214

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150214

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702776

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702776 20010125

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990709

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970919

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT