Global Patent Index - EP 0795362 B1

EP 0795362 B1 2000-10-11 - Device for the production of hollow profiles

Title (en)

Device for the production of hollow profiles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Hohlprofilen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de profilés creux

Publication

EP 0795362 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97103312 A

Priority

DE 19610425 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795362A1] Apparatus for producing hollow sections comprises a main structure (2) with a vertical mounting plate (10) carrying a rotatable winder core (17) of polygonal cross section and its drive. At least one foil strip (7, 9) is wound onto the core and is pressed against the core by rolling tools (30). At least both strip edges are preformed such that during winding they form a folded joint with the edges of the adjacent strips. Shafts installed in bearings (16) arranged concentrically around the axis of rotation of the winder core are provided with pivot arms (20, 20') carrying rolling tools (30) with forming rolls at their ends. Also claimed is a two-layered pipe, produced by the apparatus with a smooth inner layer and a corrugated outer layer of foil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 37/12; B21C 37/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/12 (2006.01); B21C 37/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/124 (2013.01); B21C 37/155 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795362 A1 19970917; EP 0795362 B1 20001011; AT 196862 T 20001015; DE 19610425 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59702436

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WESTA-HOLDING G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-04-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-01-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-01-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ABM AGENZIA BREVETTI & MARCHI

2001-01-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-01-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702436 20001116

2000-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL & PARTNER AG PATENTBUERO

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196862 T 20001015

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991203

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980119

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE