Global Patent Index - EP 0795451 B1

EP 0795451 B1 2000-01-12 - Lifting device for a horizontally placed base plate

Title (en)

Lifting device for a horizontally placed base plate

Title (de)

Hubvorrichtung für eine horizontal angeordnete Grundplatte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage pour un plateau de base posé horizontalement

Publication

EP 0795451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97103990 A

Priority

DE 19609517 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795451A2] The lifting device has at least two piston/cylinder devices for vertical movement of the horizontal platform (3) used for loading a container (2) on a rail vehicle (1). The piston/cylinder devices lie below the horizontal platform at an acute angle to the horizontal plane in the rest position, each piston rod coupled via respective linkages to both the horizontal platform and a frame (16) mounted on the rail vehicle. Each linkage is coupled to the piston rod at a common connection point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 3/20; B61D 3/04; B61D 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/04 (2006.01); B61D 3/20 (2006.01); B61D 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 47/00 (2013.01); B61D 3/04 (2013.01); B61D 3/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795451 A2 19970917; EP 0795451 A3 19980506; EP 0795451 B1 20000112; DE 19609517 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070310

2006-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MAX AICHER GMBH ENTSORGUNGSTECHNIK

2000-01-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAX AICHER GMBH ENTSORGUNGSTECHNIK

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990312

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980409

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL