Global Patent Index - EP 0795452 B1

EP 0795452 B1 2000-12-06 - Device for longitudinal centering of a container parked on supporting legs

Title (en)

Device for longitudinal centering of a container parked on supporting legs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Längszentrieren eines auf Stützfüssen abgestellten Behälters

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le centrage longitudinal d'un conteneur stationné sur des pieds de support

Publication

EP 0795452 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97103989 A

Priority

DE 19609516 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795452A2] The centring device allows a freight container (2) mounted in a number of support legs (4) to be centred longitudinally relative to a rail vehicle positioned between the legs, using at least one push-pull device (6) secured to the rails (5). The push-pull device has a clamp element (7) attached to the rails, a push-pull drive (8) with a piston/cylinder device (8') and an adjustment carriage (9) fitted around the rail vehicle wheels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 47/00; B61J 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 47/00 (2006.01); B61J 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61J 3/08 (2013.01); B61D 47/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795452 A2 19970917; EP 0795452 A3 19980624; EP 0795452 B1 20001206; DE 19609516 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070310

2006-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702700 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAX AICHER GMBH ENTSORGUNGSTECHNIK

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990721

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980528

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL