Global Patent Index - EP 0795502 B1

EP 0795502 B1 2001-05-09 - Rotation device for rotating sheets on a roller conveyor

Title (en)

Rotation device for rotating sheets on a roller conveyor

Title (de)

Drehvorrichtung für Bogen auf einer Rollenbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rotation de feuilles sur un convoyeur à rouleaux

Publication

EP 0795502 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97102765 A

Priority

FR 9603164 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795502A1] The device comprises sheets on a roller conveyor (12), which has a longitudinal sheet alignment stop (16). The sheets are rotated by a pair of rollers (20,22). The roller (20) furthest from the stop is rotated at twice the speed of the other roller. The rotational axis of the roller furthest from the stop is inclined to the normal to the stop at an angle greater than that of the roller (22) nearest the stop. The roller rotational axes inclination cause disengagement of the sheets from the stop. Each roller has its periphery in contact with a rotating ball support (24,26) or with the lower face of a sheet during its passage. The conveyor rollers (14) are inclined to the normal to the stop so as to bring back the stop onto the sheets' lateral edge. They are supported on freely rotating balls (18) in a cylindrical guide at right angles to the roller ends near the stop.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 19/08 (2006.01); B65H 5/18 (2006.01); B65H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/18 (2013.01); B65H 2301/33 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795502 A1 19970917; EP 0795502 B1 20010509; BR 9701278 A 19981110; CA 2198138 A1 19970914; CA 2198138 C 20041109; DE 69704735 D1 20010613; DE 69704735 T2 20020207; FR 2746084 A1 19970919; FR 2746084 B1 19980507; JP 3755959 B2 20060315; JP H1045280 A 19980217; US 5836439 A 19981117

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-10-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050219

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050220

2004-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. CP BOURG

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-08-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704735 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2001-05-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000913

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980304

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE