Global Patent Index - EP 0795512 B1

EP 0795512 B1 2000-07-05 - Moving walkway

Title (en)

Moving walkway

Title (de)

Fahrsteig

Title (fr)

Trottoir roulant

Publication

EP 0795512 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103795 A

Priority

EP 96103795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795512A1] The walkway has guide rollers (16) which run on rails to form chains (14) on which pallets (12) are located. These chains run on both sides of the pallets. Each pallet incorporates supports (20) which lie across the chain. These are particularly pallet bolts, which are located on the pallet chain via pick-ups. The pick-ups can pivot on tabs on the chains. The bolts lie across the chain's direction and the pick-up can be located on bearing bolts (28) parallel to them. The pick-ups may be supports, which, when the pallets are loaded, support them on the side away from the guide rollers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/10; B66B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795512 A1 19970917; EP 0795512 B1 20000705; AT 194322 T 20000715; DE 59605544 D1 20000810; ES 2148612 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605544

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100311

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-03-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148612 T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605544 20000810

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2000-07-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194322 T 20000715

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991203

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971023

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI NL