Global Patent Index - EP 0795596 B1

EP 0795596 B1 2000-10-11 - Fuel compositions

Title (en)

Fuel compositions

Title (de)

Kraftstoffzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions de combustible

Publication

EP 0795596 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97200775 A

Priority

  • EP 97200775 A
  • EP 96301782 A
  • EP 96301781 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795596A1] This invention provides a fuel composition which comprises a major amount of a fuel boiling in the gasoline boiling range and a minor amount of an additive comprising a furan derivative containing a furyl group bearing one or more substituents comprising one or more heterocyclic and/or one or more aryl groups; an additive concentrate for addition to such fuel and a method of operating an internal combustion engine using such fuel composition. Fuels of the invention give rise to octane requirement increase control and/or octane requirement reduction effects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/22; C10L 1/18; C10L 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10L 1/185 (2006.01); C10L 1/19 (2006.01); C10L 1/198 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/224 (2006.01); C10L 1/232 (2006.01); C10L 10/00 (2006.01); C10L 1/16 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/20 (2006.01); C10L 1/24 (2006.01); C10L 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/1852 (2013.01); C10L 1/143 (2013.01); C10L 1/1855 (2013.01); C10L 1/1857 (2013.01); C10L 1/19 (2013.01); C10L 1/198 (2013.01); C10L 1/224 (2013.01); C10L 1/232 (2013.01); C10L 10/04 (2013.01); C10L 1/1608 (2013.01); C10L 1/1616 (2013.01); C10L 1/1641 (2013.01); C10L 1/1824 (2013.01); C10L 1/1832 (2013.01); C10L 1/1881 (2013.01); C10L 1/1883 (2013.01); C10L 1/1905 (2013.01); C10L 1/191 (2013.01); C10L 1/1985 (2013.01); C10L 1/202 (2013.01); C10L 1/2222 (2013.01); C10L 1/2225 (2013.01); C10L 1/223 (2013.01); C10L 1/226 (2013.01); C10L 1/2286 (2013.01); C10L 1/231 (2013.01); C10L 1/238 (2013.01); C10L 1/2383 (2013.01); C10L 1/2387 (2013.01); C10L 1/2406 (2013.01); C10L 1/2431 (2013.01); C10L 1/2437 (2013.01); C10L 1/2443 (2013.01); C10L 1/245 (2013.01); C10L 1/2475 (2013.01); C10L 1/305 (2013.01); C10L 1/306 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795596 A1 19970917; EP 0795596 B1 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-12-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-12 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010226

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010222

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010219

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010208

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703260 20001116

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-09-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990406

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980121

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL