Global Patent Index - EP 0795649 A4

EP 0795649 A4 2000-04-26 - UNSYMMETRICAL STEEL SHEET PILE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (en)

UNSYMMETRICAL STEEL SHEET PILE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (de)

ASYMETRISCHER STAHLPLATTENSTAPEL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PALPLANCHE METALLIQUE ASYMETRIQUE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0795649 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96931991 A

Priority

  • JP 9602775 W
  • JP 25327595 A
  • JP 28619895 A
  • JP 16476196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9713039A1] An unsymmetrical steel sheet pile and a method for manufacturing the same in which good joint shapes can be obtained without forming any convex portion by making a joint portion of a sheet pile wall become flush with a flat arm portion, while in forming a joint bend neither unstable rolling posture nor incomplete joint is provided, and a corner steel sheet pile and a method for manufacturing the same, both being used for the unsymmetrical steel sheet pile and a method for manufacturing the same. One of unsymmetrical joints has a turned-up shape, while the other has a turned-down shape, and in forming left and right joint bends rolls with different passes are used on respective sides for finishing the bends. During this process, while the formation of one of the joint bends is being finished, the other joint is only restrained in the pass with bend formation not carried out at all or carried out halfway. The corner steel sheet pile is manufactured by inverting either the inward joint portion of the above unsymmetrical steel sheet pile or the outward joint portion thereof. In another method, it is possible to manufacture it by inwardly bending either of the joints.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/08; B21B 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/08 (2006.01); E02D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/082 (2013.01); E02D 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] FR 664775 A 19290907
  • [A] FR 1461552 A 19660225 - WENDEL & CIE DE
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 563 (M - 1058) 14 December 1990 (1990-12-14)
  • [X] "Spundwandhandbuch Profiltafeln", July 1989, HOECHST STAHL AG, DORTMUND, XP002125413
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 380 (M - 863) 23 August 1989 (1989-08-23)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 018 (M - 353) 25 January 1985 (1985-01-25)
  • See also references of WO 9713039A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9713039 A1 19970410; AU 695771 B2 19980820; AU 7095396 A 19970428; CN 1088486 C 20020731; CN 1172517 A 19980204; DE 69631950 D1 20040429; DE 69631950 T2 20050210; EP 0795649 A1 19970917; EP 0795649 A4 20000426; EP 0795649 B1 20040324; MY 120907 A 20051230; TW 320573 B 19971121

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160925

2016-10-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160925

2016-09-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160925

2016-09-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69631950

2015-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20151005

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150809

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 69631950

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69631950

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE VON PUTTKAMER - BERNGRUBER, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69631950

- Representative's name: VP-IP VON PUTTKAMER BERNGRUBER LOTH SPUHLER PA, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69631950

- Representative's name: LS-MP VON PUTTKAMER BERNGRUBER LOTH SPUHLER PA, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69631950

- Representative's name: LS-MP VON PUTTKAMER BERNGRUBER LOTH SPUHLER MU, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69631950

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE VON PUTTKAMER - BERNGRUBER, DE

2013-12-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20131108

2013-11-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131010 AND 20131016

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69631950 P 20040429

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB LU NL

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021202

2000-04-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB LU NL

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970812

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB LU NL