Global Patent Index - EP 0795681 B1

EP 0795681 B1 2000-04-26 - Actuation mechanism for variable inlet vanes in turbomachine compressor

Title (en)

Actuation mechanism for variable inlet vanes in turbomachine compressor

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für verstellbare Leitschaufeln eines Turbomaschinenkompressors

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'aubes à calage variable pour compresseur de turbomachine

Publication

EP 0795681 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400549 A

Priority

FR 9603203 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795681A1] The blade pivoting control, which is integral in the manifold (5), has a pivot (3) mounted in a bore in a platform (4) fixed to the air manifold by upstream (7) and downstream (8) flanges. The pivot is fixed by a hollow friction casing (11) in the platform bore. The casing has a circumferential slot in which the upstream part (12) of a rod is inserted. Directional control of a movable blade (2) is mounted outside the manifold. Corresponding apertures are located in the manifold and in the platform so as to enable movement of the variable wedging control by the rod. The rod upstream part has an eye into which is inserted the hollow pivot. The rod downstream part (13) is located outside the manifold and is connected to the blade directional control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 17/16; F04D 29/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/162 (2013.01); F04D 29/563 (2013.01); F05D 2230/60 (2013.01); F05D 2240/61 (2013.01); F05D 2260/20 (2013.01); F05D 2260/50 (2013.01); F05D 2260/74 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795681 A1 19970917; EP 0795681 B1 20000426; CA 2197398 A1 19970915; CA 2197398 C 20040427; DE 69701759 D1 20000531; DE 69701759 T2 20001130; FR 2746141 A1 19970919; FR 2746141 B1 19980417; US 5795128 A 19980818

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060313

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060313

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701759 20000531

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990216

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970401

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB