Global Patent Index - EP 0795877 B1

EP 0795877 B1 2001-12-05 - DC bushing

Title (en)

DC bushing

Title (de)

Gleichstromdurchführung

Title (fr)

Traversée à courant continu

Publication

EP 0795877 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97103464 A

Priority

JP 5759096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795877A2] A DC bushing (24) having an increased DC dielectric strength includes a porcelain tube (1) constituting a lower portion thereof and immersed in an insulating oil contained in a tank (11), a lower insulated shield (5) provided at a lower end portion of the porcelain tube (1) and composed of a shielding electrode (3) covered with an insulating cover (4), and a shield barrier (8) disposed around an outer periphery of the lower insulated shield (5) with an oil gap (7) being defined between the shield barrier (8) and the lower insulated shield (5). The thickness (W2) of the shield barrier (8) is greater than a width (W1) of the oil gap (7) as viewed in a direction widthwise thereof. Alternatively the shield barrier (9) is formed of a solid insulator having a higher volume resistivity than that of oil-impregnated paper or alternatively the shield barrier (8; 9) is realized in such a structure that upon application of a DC voltage, the proportion of the DC voltage to be borne by the shield barrier (8; 9) is higher than 15 % inclusive. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 17/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/34 (2006.01); H01B 17/28 (2006.01); H01B 17/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795877 A2 19970917; EP 0795877 A3 19980916; EP 0795877 B1 20011205; CN 1075659 C 20011128; CN 1162183 A 19971015; DE 69708727 D1 20020117; DE 69708727 T2 20020829; JP 2771505 B2 19980702; JP H09251814 A 19970922

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20041216

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-01-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WEIDMANN TRANSFORMERBOARD SYSTEMS AG

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-05-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020528

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708727 20020117

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE SE

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991102

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981015

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE SE

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE SE