Global Patent Index - EP 0795974 A3

EP 0795974 A3 2001-05-09 - Method and receiver for the reproduction of received spoken messages and method for transmitting spoken messages

Title (en)

Method and receiver for the reproduction of received spoken messages and method for transmitting spoken messages

Title (de)

Verfahren und Empfänger zur Wiedergabe von empfangenen gesprochenen Meldungen und Verfahren zum Senden von gesprochenen Meldungen

Title (fr)

Méthode et récepteur pour la production de messages parlés et méthode pour la transmission de messages parlés

Publication

EP 0795974 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96118965 A

Priority

  • DE 19606008 A
  • DE 19639956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0795974A2] The method involves using a receiver with a tuner (2), a Radio Data System (RDS) a signal decoder (3), a stereo decoder (4), an audio amplifier (5) and twin power amplifiers (6,7) driving two loudspeakers (8,9). The microprocessor (13) evaluates and displays (15) the RDS information, operates a changeover switch (11) between the stereo decoder and an external audio source (12), and adjusts (10) the gain of the audio amplifier. The audio signal source can be selected, and the loudness of reproduction adjusted by means of a keyboard (14). When a group of data with a predetermined content is received, the simultaneously incoming audio signals are reproduced at a predetermined level, and/or stored.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01); H04H 20/59 (2008.01); H04H 20/34 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/55 (2013.01); G08G 1/093 (2013.01); H04H 20/59 (2013.01); H04H 20/34 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] DE 4034521 A1 19910502 - PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]
  • [Y] EP 0558918 A2 19930908 - GRUNDIG EMV [DE]
  • [XY] D. KOPITZ: "Development of the Traffic Message Channel in RDS", EBU TECHNICAL REVIEW, no. 245, February 1991 (1991-02-01), Brussels, BE, pages 29 - 32, XP000204754
  • [Y] RALF DUCKECK, RUDOLPH VOLLMER: "TMC (Traffic Message Channel) - Das Verkehrsfunksystem von Morgen", ITG-FACHBERICHTE, vol. 106, 14 November 1988 (1988-11-14), Berlin, DE, pages 137 - 145, XP000607384

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0795974 A2 19970917; EP 0795974 A3 20010509; EP 0795974 B1 20060503; DE 59611343 D1 20060608

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091127

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091127

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091127

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59611343 P 20060608

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031229

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL