Global patent index - EP 0796016 B1

EP 0796016 B1 2000-05-31 - Method for processing the pixels of an image segment by a computer

Title (en)

Method for processing the pixels of an image segment by a computer

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bearbeitung von Bildpunkten eines Bildsegments durch einen Rechner

Title (fr)

Méthode de traitement par ordinateur de pixels d'un segment d'image

Publication

EP 0796016 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97103546 A

Priority

DE 19609860 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796016A2] The method involves subjecting the brightness values associated with the image points to a conformal imaging, so that at least those brightness values for image points lying on the edge of the image segment are formed on the edge of a target image segment of predefined shape. Interpolation is performed between the brightness values of the image points of the target image segment. Additional brightness values of other image points of the segment are subjected to the conformal imaging, whereby the additional brightness values are formed on target image segment image points which do not lie on the edge of the target image segment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/30; H04N 7/26; H04N 7/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 3/40 (2006.01); G09G 5/10 (2006.01); G09G 5/36 (2006.01); H04N 19/60 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 3/4007 (2013.01); G06T 3/403 (2013.01); H04N 19/649 (2014.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19609860 C1 19970904; EP 0796016 A2 19970917; EP 0796016 A3 19971217; EP 0796016 B1 20000531; JP H09244610 A 19970919; US 6208768 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040304

2003-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030328

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701796

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990819

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980320

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT