Global patent index - EP 0796114 A4

EP 0796114 A4 2000-06-14 - BIOFILM AVOIDANCE AND REMOVAL PROCESS AND COMPOSITION

Title (en)

BIOFILM AVOIDANCE AND REMOVAL PROCESS AND COMPOSITION

Title (de)

VERMEIDUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN FILMEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER BESEITIGUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'EVITER LA FORMATION D'UN FILM BIOLOGIQUE, DE L'OTER ET COMPOSITION CORRESPONDANTE

Publication

EP 0796114 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95940866 A

Priority

  • DE 4445070 A
  • US 9515500 W
  • US 46521495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9617632A1] The present invention relates to the use of at least one enzyme component from the group consisting of carbohydrases, proteases, lipases and glycol proteases and a short-chained glycol component for the avoidance of slime formation and/or for the removal of biofilm on surfaces of water-bearing systems, in particular of industrial process-water systems. The enzyme component(s) and the glycol component can be added to the water-bearing system either separately, i.e., at different points, or in the form of an enzymatic composition containing the enzyme component(s) and the glycol component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 2/18; B08B 17/00; C02F 3/00; C11D 1/68; C11D 7/42; D21H 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 17/00 (2006.01); A01N 63/00 (2006.01); A61L 2/18 (2006.01); C02F 1/00 (2006.01); C02F 1/50 (2006.01); C02F 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 7/26 (2006.01); D21H 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 3/342 (2013.01); C02F 1/50 (2013.01); C02F 2103/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9617632 A1 19960613; AU 4247496 A 19960626; AU 695600 B2 19980820; BR 9509974 A 19980609; CA 2203436 A1 19960613; CN 1168637 A 19971224; CZ 9701738 A3 19981014; EP 0796114 A1 19970924; EP 0796114 A4 20000614; FI 972388 A0 19970605; FI 972388 A 19970605; JP H10509642 A 19980922; MX 9704090 A 19970930; NO 972499 A 19970606; NO 972499 D0 19970602; NZ 297334 A 19980826

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020116

2000-06-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BETZDEARBORN INC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BETZDEARBORN EUROPE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: EYERS, MARK

1997-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VAN PEE, KRISTINE

1997-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VAN POELE, JOS

1997-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHUETZ, JURGEN, FRIEDRICH

1997-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHENKER, ACHIM, P.

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970702

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE