Global patent index - EP 0796277 A4

EP 0796277 A4 2001-01-24 - REAGENTS AND PROCESSES FOR TARGETING MUTANT EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTORS

Title (en)

REAGENTS AND PROCESSES FOR TARGETING MUTANT EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTORS

Title (de)

REAGENTIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBEREXPRESSION VON MÜTIERTEN EPIDERMALEN WACHSTUMSFAKTORREZEPTOREN

Title (fr)

REACTIFS ET PROCEDE DE CIBLAGE DES RECEPTEURS MUTANTS DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DE L'EPIDERME

Publication

EP 0796277 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95943342 A

Priority

  • US 9515401 W
  • US 34752094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9616988A1] Cell lines are provided for the overexpression of Type III mutant EGF receptor. Method of producing these cell lines are also provided. In addition, antibodies raised against peptides expressed by these cell lines are provided. Vaccines comprising peptides from a fusion junction present in a mutant human EGF receptor and methods of using these vaccines in the inhibition of tumor formation and enhancement of tumor regression are also provided. Further, antisense oligonucleotides targeted to a mutant EGF receptor which decreases expression of a mutant EGF receptor are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/70; C07K 14/71; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/71 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/71 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9103489 A1 19910321 - UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al
  • [XD] HUMPHREY P A ET AL: "ANTI-SYNTHETIC PEPTIDE ANTIBODY REACTING AT THE FUSION JUNCTION OF DELETION-MUTANT EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTORS IN HUMAN GLIOBLASTOMA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, vol. 87, no. 11, 1 June 1990 (1990-06-01), pages 4207 - 4211, XP000133024, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [X] GARCIA DE PALAZZO I. ET AL.: "Expression of mutated Epidermal Growth Factor Receptor by non-small cell lung carcinomas", CANCER RES., vol. 53, 15 July 1993 (1993-07-15), pages 3217 - 3220, XP002153548
  • [A] VELU T.J. ET AL.: "Retroviruses expressing different levels of the normal epidermal growth factor receptor: biological properties and new bioassay.", J. CELL. BIOCHEM., vol. 39, 1989, pages 153 - 166, XP000946629
  • [A] RIEDEL H. ET AL.: "Ligand activation of overexpressed epidermal growth factor receptors transforms NIH 3T3 mouse fibroblasts", PROC.NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 85, March 1988 (1988-03-01), pages 1477 - 1481, XP002148731
  • [PX] WIKSTRAND C J ET AL: "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AGAINST EGFRVIII ARE TUMOR SPECIFIC AND REACT WITH BREAST AND LUNG CARCINOMAS AND MALIGNANT GLIOMAS", CANCER RESEARCH,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, vol. 55, 15 July 1995 (1995-07-15), pages 3140 - 3148, XP002074673, ISSN: 0008-5472
  • See also references of WO 9616988A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9616988 A1 19960606; AT 262586 T 20040415; CA 2206343 A1 19960606; CA 2206343 C 20090407; DE 69532767 D1 20040429; DE 69532767 T2 20040812; EP 0796277 A1 19970924; EP 0796277 A4 20010124; EP 0796277 B1 20040324; JP 2007297398 A 20071115; JP 4620808 B2 20110126; JP H10509878 A 19980929; US 6224868 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-12-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151127

2015-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-11-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69532767

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040824

2006-04-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-11-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041128

2004-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-07-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-06-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-06-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-06-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69532767

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/12 A

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/10 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/71 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/28 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/70 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/00 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/86 -

2003-10-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: FUSION JUNCTION TYPE III MUTANT EGF RECEPTOR PEPTIDE TUMOUR VACCINE

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030325

2001-01-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12N 15/12 A, 7C 12N 5/10 B, 7C 07K 14/71 B, 7C 07K 16/28 B, 7C 07K 14/70 B, 7A 61K 38/17 B, 7C 12N 15/86 -

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970607

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE