Global Patent Index - EP 0796359 B1

EP 0796359 B1 2000-04-05 - DEVICE FOR MOUNTING A SPINNING, TWISTING OR PACKAGE WINDING SPINDLE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MOUNTING A SPINNING, TWISTING OR PACKAGE WINDING SPINDLE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR LAGERUNG EINER SPINN-, ZWIRN- ODER UMWINDESPINDEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE LOGER UNE BROCHE DE FILATURE, DE RETORDAGE OU DE GUIPAGE

Publication

EP 0796359 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95941682 A

Priority

  • DE 4443631 A
  • EP 9504801 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4443631A1] Disclosed is a device for mounting a spinning, twisting or package winding spindle, with a step bearing (11) and a neck bearing (12), both of which are mounted in a common bearing housing (10), for the spindle which is provided with an outer housing (14) in which the step area (10.1) of the bearing housing (10) is articulated and an upper section (10.2) of the bearing housing (10) is mounted in such a way that it is radially sprung.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4443631 A1 19960613; CZ 9701596 A3 19991215; EP 0796359 A1 19970924; EP 0796359 B1 20000405; WO 9617983 A1 19960613

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508150 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

1999-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEXPARTS GMBH

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980303

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970527

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI