Global Patent Index - EP 0796580 B1

EP 0796580 B1 2001-03-14 - Spring core for cushion

Title (en)

Spring core for cushion

Title (de)

Federkern für Polster

Title (fr)

Noyau à ressorts pour coussin

Publication

EP 0796580 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100304 A

Priority

CH 27996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796580A1] The core comprises a large number of springs (4) which are inserted in the central foam body (3), on which there are covering layers. The body is profiled on both sides and has protrusions (5) and recesses of a mating geometrical shape. The springs are accommodated in the recesses. Parallel ribs, which can be of trapezium or rectangular cross-section, can be formed on both sides of the body, and spiral springs can be used, their ends resting on the protrusions. The covering layers (2) can be glued to the protrusions, with the spring ends between them. The spring ends can be 60 mm. diameter, or the springs may be of a double-cone shape.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/053 (2013.01); A47C 27/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0796580 A1 19970924; EP 0796580 B1 20010314; AT 199633 T 20010315; DE 59703121 D1 20010419

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070110

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-03-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050113

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050104

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703121 20010419

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199633 T 20010315

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990622

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980128

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI