Global Patent Index - EP 0796660 B1

EP 0796660 B1 2000-06-14 - Method and device for fabricating ultrafine powders

Title (en)

Method and device for fabricating ultrafine powders

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von extrem feinen Pulvern

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de poudres ultrafines

Publication

EP 0796660 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104100 A

Priority

  • DE 19611112 A
  • US 98553597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796660A1] The system has an air-turbulence mill (4) which is used to dry the powder while in suspension. Hot air can be supplied to the drying mill as a carrier gas, the inlet and outlet temperatures being respectively 200 to 500 and 70 to 110 degrees celsius. The suspension containing the powder can be sprayed by nozzles into the mill drying chamber (5), and surface treatment of the powder can be carried out in the mill in addition to the drying operation, typically using a liquid sprayed by nozzles into the chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 21/00; B02C 13/14; B02C 17/16; B02C 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/14 (2006.01); B02C 17/16 (2006.01); B02C 21/00 (2006.01); B02C 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 23/24 (2013.01); B02C 13/14 (2013.01); B02C 17/16 (2013.01); B02C 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0796660 A1 19970924; EP 0796660 B1 20000614; DE 19611112 A1 19970925; DE 19611112 C2 20020418; US 5984212 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701868

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050312

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALTENBURGER MASCHINEN JACKERING G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040315

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-03-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-09-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701868 20000720

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981027

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980105

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT