Global patent index - EP 0796665 B1

EP 0796665 B1 2000-07-12 - Process and system for supplying paint to a coatinginstallation

Title (en)

Process and system for supplying paint to a coatinginstallation

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Farbversorgung einer Beschichtungsanlage

Title (fr)

Système et procédé d'alimentation en peinture d'une installation de revêtement

Publication

EP 0796665 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104631 A

Priority

DE 19610589 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796665A2] The method employs cartridges (2) of different colours arranged on a carousel (1), filled automatically at a replenishment station (4) and moved singly by a linear piston-cylinder unit (12) at a transfer station (10) to a spray coating robot, which slides (15) parallel to the workpiece conveyor and can be pivoted between a working position (14a) and a cartridge-changing position (14b). Preferably, the transferred cartridge (2') is inserted into a robot arm (16) while the latter is vertical. After use, it is returned to the transfer station and taken back to the replenishment station for reuse.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 12/14; B05B 5/16; B05B 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/16 (2006.01); B05B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 13/0431 (2013.01); B05B 5/1625 (2013.01); B05B 12/1463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0796665 A2 19970924; EP 0796665 A3 19980408; EP 0796665 B1 20000712; DE 19610589 A1 19970925; ES 2148864 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160318

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20140311

2014-08-14 [REG DE R042] PATENT'S REVOCATION IN FULL NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R042

- Ref Document Number: 59701990

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140311

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148864

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701990

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-06-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980519

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980325

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-08 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: B05B 12/14

1997-12-10 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C1

- Effective date: 19970924

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE