Global Patent Index - EP 0796671 B1

EP 0796671 B1 2001-05-09 - Image acquisition system for parcel sorting

Title (en)

Image acquisition system for parcel sorting

Title (de)

Bilderfassungssystem für Paketensortierung

Title (fr)

Système d'acquisition d'images pour le tri de paquets

Publication

EP 0796671 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400627 A

Priority

FR 9603606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796671A1] The system comprises a high resolution camera (1) mounted above a conveyor belt (4) on which objects are placed, with their sides to be examined uppermost. The camera is fitted with an objective lens (5) with a motorised focussing mechanism operating with a sensor (8) which produces a signal representative of the height profile of the upper face of each object w.r.t. the conveyor plane. This profile signal serves to produce reference positions (C) for the focussing system, taking account of variations in the height of the upper surface of each object as it passes in front of the camera. The sensor used may be a telemetry laser, whilst the camera may be a CCD device and the motorised control operated by a DC electric motor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/00 (2006.01); B07C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0796671 A1 19970924; EP 0796671 B1 20010509; DE 69704738 D1 20010613; DE 69704738 T2 20020207; ES 2157051 T3 20010801; FR 2746330 A1 19970926; FR 2746330 B1 19980417; JP H10187952 A 19980721; US 6122001 A 20000919

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050320

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030410

2002-11-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157051 T3

2001-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704738 20010613

2001-05-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANN DEMATIC POSTAL AUTOMATION S.A.

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980127

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT