Global Patent Index - EP 0796736 B1

EP 0796736 B1 2001-05-09 - Cleaning device on rotary printing machines

Title (en)

Cleaning device on rotary printing machines

Title (de)

Reinigungseinrichtung an Rotationsdruckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage de machines d'impression rotatives

Publication

EP 0796736 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97103055 A

Priority

DE 19611125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796736A2] The cleaning device has a profiled elastic rail (12) which forms a guide for the cloth (13). This presses the cloth against the cylinder surface for the whole of the latter's width. The rams (19) move the bar (6) into position, and pressure is transmitted to the rail via springs (8,11) supported on the bar. A spring strip (9) between the springs and the rail ensures even load distribution. The springs (11) can be of the compression type on bolts (8), being adjusted by nuts. The spring strip can be of steel, with the rail interchangeably mounted on it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/06 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0796736 A2 19970924; EP 0796736 A3 19971001; EP 0796736 B1 20010509; CN 1111478 C 20030618; CN 1165087 A 19971119; DE 19611125 A1 19970925; DE 19611125 C2 19990902; HK 1003172 A1 20040220; JP 3982867 B2 20070926; JP H10762 A 19980106; US 5878669 A 19990309

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59703489

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070226

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080226

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080226

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703489 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970226

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI