EP 0796740 A3 19981230 - Ink jet recording method and apparatus and recorded matter
Title (en)
Ink jet recording method and apparatus and recorded matter
Title (de)
Farbstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät und -verfahren und Aufzeichnungsstoff
Title (fr)
Appareil et méthode d'enregistrement à jet d'encre et matière enregistrée
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 93301199 A 19930218
- JP 3948992 A 19920226
- JP 3949292 A 19920226
- JP 10767092 A 19920427
- JP 19393492 A 19920721
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0796740A2] An ink jet textile printing apparatus for performing the recording by reading an original image created by the designer, converting the original image into original data represented by an electric signal, retrieving the original data for the processing to be output as image data, and recording data on the cloths based on the image data. The ink jet textile printing apparatus has a first ink jet recording head (31) provided upstream of the recording, and a second ink jet recording head (31') provided downstream thereof, and is provided with a drying unit (35) between both recording heads, whereby high-quality recorded image with less bleeding can be obtained by recording on said recording area again with the second ink jet recording head (31') after drying a recording area on the cloths recorded by the first ink jet recording head (31) with the drying unit (35).
IPC 1-7
B41J 11/00; B41J 3/54; B41J 29/393; B41J 2/165; G06K 15/10; D06P 5/00
IPC 8 full level
B41F 17/00 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B41J 3/54 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 29/377 (2006.01); D06B 11/00 (2006.01); D06P 5/30 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
B41F 17/00 (2013.01 - EP); B41J 3/4078 (2013.01 - EP KR); B41J 3/543 (2013.01 - EP KR US); B41J 11/002 (2013.01 - EP US); B41J 11/0022 (2021.01 - EP KR US); B41J 11/0024 (2021.01 - EP US); B41J 29/377 (2013.01 - EP); B41J 29/393 (2013.01 - KR); D06B 11/0059 (2013.01 - EP); D06P 5/30 (2013.01 - EP KR); B41J 2202/16 (2013.01 - KR)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] EP 0376345 A1 19900704 - CANON KK [JP]
- [PX] EP 0500281 A2 19920826 - CANON KK [JP]
- [X] EP 0450287 A2 19911009 - CANON KK [JP]
- [XAY] EP 0461759 A2 19911218 - CANON KK [JP]
- [X] EP 0442711 A1 19910821 - CANON KK [JP]
- [X] EP 0447262 A1 19910918 - CANON KK [JP]
- [YA] US 5005025 A 19910402 - MIYAKAWA AKIRA [JP], et al
- [Y] EP 0212655 A2 19870304 - CANON KK [JP]
- [YA] EP 0332787 A1 19890920 - MILLIASSEAU FLAUNET FRANCIS [FR], et al
- [A] US 4982207 A 19910101 - TUNMORE DAVID F [US], et al
- [A] EP 0291738 A1 19881123 - CANON KK [JP]
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 187 (M - 098) 26 November 1981 (1981-11-26)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 211 (C - 0715) 2 May 1990 (1990-05-02)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 215 (M - 606) 11 July 1987 (1987-07-11)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 084 (M - 371) 13 April 1985 (1985-04-13)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0558236 A2 19930901; EP 0558236 A3 19931013; EP 0558236 B1 19980902; AT E170461 T1 19980915; AT E227651 T1 20021115; DE 69320672 D1 19981008; DE 69320672 T2 19990225; DE 69332488 D1 20021219; DE 69332488 T2 20030612; EP 0796740 A2 19970924; EP 0796740 A3 19981230; EP 0796740 B1 20021113; KR 0139038 B1 19980515; KR 930017717 A 19930920
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 93301199 A 19930218; AT 93301199 T 19930218; AT 97201161 T 19930218; DE 69320672 T 19930218; DE 69332488 T 19930218; EP 97201161 A 19930218; KR 930002743 A 19930226