Global Patent Index - EP 0796776 B1

EP 0796776 B1 2000-01-12 - Device for the transport of loads by a self propelled railborne truck with 40KG payload

Title (en)

Device for the transport of loads by a self propelled railborne truck with 40KG payload

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Transport von Lasten durch ein selbstfahrendes, schienengebundenes Laufwerk mit 4o kp Nutzlast

Title (fr)

Appareil de transport de charges par chariot automoteur sur rails de 40 KG de charge utile

Publication

EP 0796776 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400593 A

Priority

EP 96400593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796776A1] The load bogie comprises a central part (1) consisting of a rigid structure (2,2',3,3') carried on rails (40) by an axle with four independent bogies (7,8). The central part has a support (4) and removable fixings (33) for the load. Each bogie has a directional arm (5,5') carrying two wheels (7,8) engaged on the rail. The arms are pivoted about an axle perpendicular to the rails and along a transverse axle (31) parallel to the rails. Two axially opposite end parts (10) each comprise a reduction motor assembly (11,12) coupled to the wheels. The reduction motor assemblies are connected to the central part by a double pivoting system (18,19) comprising a central shaft (21) perpendicular to the rails and a transverse shaft (20) parallel to the rails. The pivoting system also comprises two coaxial wheels (16,16') engaged on the rails in two places axially separated from the drive wheels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61C 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61C 11/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0796776 A1 19970924; EP 0796776 B1 20000112; AT 188655 T 20000115; DE 69606159 D1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2000-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FLUIDELEC

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-07-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-04-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606159 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI LU NL

2000-01-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188655 T 20000115

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981218

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960329

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI LU NL