Global Patent Index - EP 0796808 B1

EP 0796808 B1 2001-05-09 - Pipe switch for pneumatically transported bulk material

Title (en)

Pipe switch for pneumatically transported bulk material

Title (de)

Rohrweiche für pneumatisch geförderte Schüttgüter

Title (fr)

Aiguillage de tuyaux pour le transport pneumatique de matière en vrac

Publication

EP 0796808 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97103822 A

Priority

  • DE 19611121 A
  • US 82132397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796808A1] The pipe distributor has a housing with three pipe connections, and a connecting cock with two flow channels. A pipe intake (3) in the housing is connected to one of the pipe outlets (4,5) in the housing via a flexible pre-curved spiral hose (2). The hose connects all three pipe connections (3-5), and has a slide (6) with support bracket (10). A seal carrier has a guide arm (7) to generate a 360 degrees movement of the hose. A gas pressure spring engages on the part of the hose connected to the pipe intake, while its other end supports itself on the turnable slide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 53/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 53/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65G 53/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0796808 A1 19970924; EP 0796808 B1 20010509; DE 19611121 A1 19970925; US 5741094 A 19980421

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050307

2004-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-12-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MOTAN MATERIALS HANDLING GMBH

2002-08-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: MOTAN-FULLER VERFAHRENSTECHNIK GMBH TRANSFER- MOTAN MATERIALS HANDLING GMBH

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-07-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703490 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980929

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971223

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL