Global Patent Index - EP 0796812 B1

EP 0796812 B1 2000-01-19 - Method and device for winding a plurality of yarn batches simultaneously

Title (en)

Method and device for winding a plurality of yarn batches simultaneously

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum gleichzeitigen Wickeln einer Mehrzahl von Garnpartien

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour bobiner simultanément plusieurs lots de fils textiles

Publication

EP 0796812 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97200735 A

Priority

IT MI960524 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796812A1] An automatic winding machine for simultaneously winding a plurality of yarn batches to be fed to separate stations (12) of the winding machine, in which the packages (2) are carried by transporting caddies (1) each identified by its own code which distinguishes it from all other caddies, the code being associated with the identification of the type of package loaded onto it, the winding stations being provided with code readers (39) to identify the caddy in transit and hence its package batch. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/06; D01H 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/06 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/187 (2013.01); B65H 67/06 (2013.01); B65H 67/063 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0796812 A1 19970924; EP 0796812 B1 20000119; CN 1075028 C 20011121; CN 1163855 A 19971105; DE 69701159 D1 20000224; DE 69701159 T2 20000713; ES 2141573 T3 20000316; IT 1283270 B1 19980416; IT MI960524 A1 19970918; IT MI960524 D0 19960318

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAVIO MACCHINE TESSILI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060313

2007-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060313

2005-05-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050509

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-03-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020313

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2141573 T3

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701159 20000224

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981106

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971126

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI