Global Patent Index - EP 0796966 B1

EP 0796966 B1 2000-05-17 - Locking device

Title (en)

Locking device

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0796966 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104337 A

Priority

DE 19613018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0796966A1] The device comprises a locking member (3) with head (9), working against a wall (15). An actuating member (5) is slid by a drive mechanism (7) in the lengthwise direction of the locking member and works against a curved face on the latter. This causes a further face on the locking member to roll against the wall (15), thrusting the member head (9) sideways in the process. The wall forms part of a preferably box-shaped housing (1). The curved face, and the face rolling against the wall, can be formed by the edges of ribs, and the latter face may curve to a smaller radius.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 5/00; E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 5/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 5/00 (2013.01); E05C 9/1833 (2013.01); E05C 9/1875 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0796966 A1 19970924; EP 0796966 B1 20000517; AT 193084 T 20000615; DE 19613018 A1 19970925

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701686

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130314

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130314

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130314

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110314

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOMBECK JURGEN

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOMBECK JURGEN

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050315

2004-03-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701686 20000621

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193084 T 20000615

1997-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970911

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970715

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE