Global Patent Index - EP 0797000 B1

EP 0797000 B1 2001-05-30 - Starting load reducing device for refrigerant compressor

Title (en)

Starting load reducing device for refrigerant compressor

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Reduzierung der Startlast für Kältemittelverdichter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réduction de la charge de démarrage pour compresseur de réfrigérant

Publication

EP 0797000 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97301697 A

Priority

JP 6444896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0797000A1] A device for reducing the starting load which occurs when starting up the compressor for automotive air conditioning system, is disclosed. The starting load reducing device is composed of a piston, a cap like member, and a tension coil spring made of shape-memory alloy disposed between them. In the actual refrigerant circuit, the starting load reducing device may be disposed anywhere between the outlet of evaporator and inlet port of compressor. When starting up the compressor, the flow of refrigerant gas from evaporator to suction chamber of the compressor is restricted to minimum value by the device. So the starting load of the compressor is suppressed effectively. After some time has lapsed, the temperature of refrigerant from the outlet of evaporator will gradually decreases to the transformation temperature of coil spring made of shape-memory alloy, due to small amount of continued operation of compressor. Temperature decrease in the refrigerant in the device will cause the martensitic transformation of the coil spring to occur, so that at this moment a full communication between the outlet of the evaporator and the suction chamber is realized . And stationary operation of the compressor enters with this elastically soft state of coil spring in the starting load reducing device. Thus, the purpose of eliminating an uncomfortable drive feeling due to the torque shock by suppressing the starting load of a compressor is attained. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/22; F04B 49/03; F25B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/06 (2006.01); F04B 27/14 (2006.01); F04B 27/18 (2006.01); F04B 49/03 (2006.01); F04B 49/22 (2006.01); F25B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/043 (2013.01); F04B 27/1804 (2013.01); F04B 49/03 (2013.01); F04B 49/225 (2013.01); F04B 2205/10 (2013.01); F25B 2500/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0797000 A1 19970924; EP 0797000 B1 20010530; DE 69704977 D1 20010705; DE 69704977 T2 20020404; JP H09256958 A 19970930

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704977

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704977

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704977 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000105

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980306

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE