Global Patent Index - EP 0797005 B1

EP 0797005 B1 2002-09-11 - Retention device for blade roots in a compressor

Title (en)

Retention device for blade roots in a compressor

Title (de)

Festhalter des Schaufelfusses in einem Verdichter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de retenue du pied des aubes d'une soufflante

Publication

EP 0797005 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400620 A

Priority

FR 9603497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0797005A1] The blade retainer, designed to hold the blade root in a rotor disc socket, consists of a wedge in the shape of a curved metal plate, fitted under the foot of the blade, with apertures which are filled with a semi-rigid elastomer material (13, 14, 15, 18, 19). The wedge has a central essentially metal zone (12) which extends as far as one edge of the blade and has a surface which is recessed relative to the rotor disc socket. It also has two completely metal end zones.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/32; F01D 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/30 (2006.01); F04D 29/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/323 (2013.01); F04D 29/322 (2013.01); Y10S 416/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0797005 A1 19970924; EP 0797005 B1 20020911; CA 2196745 A1 19970922; CA 2196745 C 20040914; DE 69715278 D1 20021017; DE 69715278 T2 20030508; FR 2746456 A1 19970926; FR 2746456 B1 19980430; JP 3907259 B2 20070418; JP H108907 A 19980113; US 5820347 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES

- Effective date: 20170719

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2002-11-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715278 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA MOTEURS

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970411

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB