Global Patent Index - EP 0797052 B1

EP 0797052 B1 2001-12-19 - Retractable operating element

Title (en)

Retractable operating element

Title (de)

Versenkbares Bedienelement

Title (fr)

Elément de contrôle escamotable

Publication

EP 0797052 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104130 A

Priority

DE 19610921 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0797052A1] The switch (10) is fitted into an opening (22) e.g. in the glass-ceramic surface (20) of the stove and completely surrounded by a guard ring (24), to the underside of which a sealing ring (26) is bonded or welded. In the depressed position, as depicted, the knob (12) lies entirely within the surface. For heating of the corresponding zone of the surface, the knob is pulled out sufficiently far for the sealing ring to remain in contact with the rim of the knob. This guarantees that no liquid can drain into the opening in either the depressed or the protruding position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/12 (2006.01); F24C 7/08 (2006.01); G05G 1/08 (2006.01); G05G 25/04 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2013.01); F24C 3/126 (2013.01); F24C 7/082 (2013.01); G05G 1/087 (2013.01); G05G 25/04 (2013.01); H01H 2003/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0797052 A1 19970924; EP 0797052 B1 20011219; CA 2200375 A1 19970920; DE 19610921 A1 19970925; DE 19610921 C2 19991007; ES 2169284 T3 20020701

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030313

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169284 T3

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020309

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020222

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705835 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

1998-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT GLAS

1998-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS SCHOTT GLAS

1998-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT GLAS

1998-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS SCHOTT GLASWERKE

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970326

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB