Global Patent Index - EP 0797271 B1

EP 0797271 B1 2002-09-25 - Base for current socket

Title (en)

Base for current socket

Title (de)

Sockel für Stromsteckdose

Title (fr)

Socle de prise de courant

Publication

EP 0797271 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400585 A

Priority

FR 9603620 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0797271A1] The socket includes a protective device (35), including the moving shutters (37), which is fixed to the mechanism (11) by a support interposed in the space in the observation window (38,39). Each window is at least sufficiently narrow locally to oppose the passage of a test finger by the normal arrangement of the insulating material of the body (12). The window is at least partially covered by a transparent disc belonging to a small transparent plate which is common to the assembly and also is fixed to and overhangs from the device. The measurement of at least one of the windows in the direction of engagement is greater than half the mean diameter of the holes at rest.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/44; H01R 24/06; H01R 24/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/44 (2006.01); H01R 13/447 (2006.01); H01R 24/78 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/78 (2013.01); H01R 13/44 (2013.01); H01R 13/652 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI GR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0797271 A1 19970924; EP 0797271 B1 20020925; AT 225091 T 20021015; DE 69715707 D1 20021031; DE 69715707 T2 20030206; ES 2184042 T3 20030401; FR 2746549 A1 19970926; FR 2746549 B1 19980529; HU 221212 B1 20020828; HU 9700624 A2 19980128; HU 9700624 A3 20000328; HU 9700624 D0 19970528; ID 19636 A 19980723; PL 182336 B1 20011231; PL 319067 A1 19970929; PT 797271 E 20030131; TR 199700202 A2 19990823; TR 199700202 A3 19990823

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND SNC

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060318

2006-11-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-09-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060318

2006-03-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060317

2006-03-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060317

2005-04-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-14 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-25 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-17 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184042 T3

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404145

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715707 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GR PT

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225091 T 20021015

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/44 A, 7H 01R 24/06 B, 7H 01R 24/08 B

2002-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/44 A, 7H 01R 24/06 B, 7H 01R 24/08 B

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971027

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GR PT