Global Patent Index - EP 0797388 A4

EP 0797388 A4 2000-03-29 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A BIOLOGICAL RODENTICIDE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A BIOLOGICAL RODENTICIDE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BIOLOGISCHEN RODENTIZIDS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'OBTENTION D'UN RODENTICIDE BIOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 0797388 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96934329 A

Priority

  • CU 9600001 W
  • VN 141795 A
  • CN 97111646 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9712522A1] The present invention relates to the field of biocides and particularly to a process for producing in large quantities a rodenticide substance of microbiological origin. The disclosed process of the invention is based on the standardization of the production of the substrate which is used, as well of the fermentation process using a strain of Salmonella enteritidis, which strain is used as a biocide substance for regulating the population of rodents. Additionally, an anticoagulant compound is used to potentiate the lethal effect of said microorganism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 63/00; C12N 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 63/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/20 (2006.01); C12R 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 25/004 (2013.01); A01N 63/00 (2013.01); C12N 1/20 (2013.01); C12R 1/42 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 25/004 + A01N 63/00 + A01N 43/16
  2. A01N 63/00 + A01N 43/16
  3. A01N 63/00 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 77947, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class C03, AN 1979-85536B, XP002128228
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 7609, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class C03, AN 1976-16318X, XP002128229
  • [XY] ESPINO, R. ET AL: "Influence of environmental factors on a Salmonella enteritidis-warfarin p for the biological control of harmful rodents Influencia de los factores ambientales sobre un biopreparado microbiologi lucha contra los roedores daninos", REVISTA CUBANA DE CIENCIAS VETERINARIAS, (1989) VOL. 20, NO. 4, PP. 267-2 ISSN: 0048-7678, XP002128227
  • See also references of WO 9712522A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9712522 A1 19970410; BR 9606680 A 19971021; CA 2206660 A1 19971004; CN 1135925 C 20040128; CN 1194781 A 19981007; EP 0797388 A1 19971001; EP 0797388 A4 20000329; MX 9704113 A 19980731

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-03-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971120

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE