Global Patent Index - EP 0797454 A4

EP 0797454 A4 2001-12-05 - IMPROVED ADENOVIRAL VECTORS AND PRODUCER CELLS

Title (en)

IMPROVED ADENOVIRAL VECTORS AND PRODUCER CELLS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE ADENOVIRALE VEKTOREN UND ZELLEN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

VECTEURS ADENOVIRAUX AMELIORES ET CELLULES PRODUCTRICES

Publication

EP 0797454 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95943705 A

Priority

  • US 9515947 W
  • US 35508794 A
  • US 45840395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9618418A1] An adenoviral vector wherein the adenoviral genome has been modified to reduce the host immune and inflammatory responses to the vector. In one embodiment, the adenoviral vector including an adenoviral 5' ITR; an adenoviral 3' ITR; an adenoviral encapsidation signal; at least one DNA sequence encoding a protein or polypeptide of interest; and a promoter controlling the DNA sequence(s) encoding the protein(s) or polypeptide(s) of interest. The adenoviral vector is free of all or a portion of each of the adenoviral E1 and E4 DNA sequences, or is free of all or a portion of each of the adenoviral E1 and E2 DNA sequences, or is free of all or a portion of each of the E1, E2 and E4 DNA sequences. Also disclosed and claimed is a producer cell for generating adenoviral vector particles, wherein the producer cell includes an adenoviral E1 DNA sequence and an adenoviral E4 DNA sequence, or includes an adenoviral E1 DNA sequence and an adenoviral E2a DNA sequence, or includes the adenoviral E1, E2a and E4 DNA sequences.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; C07K 5/12; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 9/14 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/21 (2006.01); A61K 38/28 (2006.01); A61K 38/43 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 3/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/08 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 7/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/861 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01); C12R 1/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10343 (2013.01); C12N 2800/108 (2013.01); C12N 2800/70 (2013.01); C12N 2830/002 (2013.01); C12N 2830/15 (2013.01); C12N 2830/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9534671 A1 19951221 - GENVEC INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9614061 A1 19960517 - CELL GENESYS INC [US]
  • [E] WO 9610088 A1 19960404 - RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al
  • [E] WO 9613596 A1 19960509 - RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al
  • [PX] WO 9429471 A1 19941222 - GENETIC THERAPY INC [US]
  • [X] ARMENTANO D ET AL: "Second generation adenovirus vectors for cystic fibrosis gene therapy.", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY SUPPLEMENT, no. 18 PART A, 1994, Keystone Symposium on Gene Therapy;Copper Mountain, Colorado, USA; January 15-22, 1994, pages 222, XP001000902, ISSN: 0733-1959
  • [A] BRIDGE E ET AL: "ADENOVIRUS EARLY REGION 4 AND VIRAL DNA SYNTHESIS", VIROLOGY,US,ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO, vol. 193, no. 2, 1 April 1993 (1993-04-01), pages 794 - 801, XP002051623, ISSN: 0042-6822
  • [A] G KETNER ET AL: "Complementation of adenovirus E4 mutants by transient expression of E4 cDNA and deletion plasmids", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH,IRL PRESS LTD., OXFORD,GB, vol. 17, no. 8, 1989, pages 3037 - 3048, XP002003252, ISSN: 0305-1048
  • [T] GORZIGLIA M I ET AL: "GENERATION OF AN ADENOVIRUS VECTOR LACKING E1, E2A, E3, AND ALL OF E4 EXCEPT OPEN READING FRAME 3", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY,THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY,US, vol. 73, no. 7, July 1999 (1999-07-01), pages 6048 - 6055, XP000939338, ISSN: 0022-538X
  • See also references of WO 9618418A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9618418 A1 19960620; AU 4511196 A 19960703; AU 709498 B2 19990902; CA 2206683 A1 19960620; EP 0797454 A1 19971001; EP 0797454 A4 20011205; JP H10510987 A 19981027; NZ 300387 A 20010727

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-12-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 48/00 A, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7C 07K 5/12 B

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970611

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE