Global Patent Index - EP 0797469 B1

EP 0797469 B1 2001-12-05 - GAME ASSEMBLY FOR PLAYING RUMMY OR SIMILAR GAMES

Title (en)

GAME ASSEMBLY FOR PLAYING RUMMY OR SIMILAR GAMES

Title (de)

SPIELANORDNUNG ZUM ROMMESPIELEN ODER ÄHNLICHER SPIELE

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE JEU POUR JOUER AU RAMI OU A DES JEUX SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 0797469 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95904696 A

Priority

  • NL 9500014 W
  • NL 9400058 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9519209A1] Game assembly for playing a "Rummy"-like game, comprising nine dice having six faces each, wherein the faces together possess four series, differing in colour but otherwise similar, of thirteen different figures of consecutive rank and each dice is provided with figures of each of the four colours, wherein the dice are provided with six different figures, independent of the colour.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/04 (2006.01); A63F 1/00 (2006.01); A63F 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/0413 (2013.01); A63F 9/20 (2013.01); A63F 2001/006 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0475 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9519209 A1 19950720; AT 209947 T 20011215; AU 1327695 A 19950801; DE 69524450 D1 20020117; DE 69524450 T2 20020725; EP 0797469 A1 19971001; EP 0797469 B1 20011205; NL 194465 B 20020102; NL 194465 C 20020503; NL 9400058 A 19950801

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150109

2015-02-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150109

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-08-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1004805

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020517

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020516

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524450 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-12-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209947 T 20011215

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981029

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960715

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL