Global Patent Index - EP 0797522 B1

EP 0797522 B1 2001-03-21 - CORRUGATED STRUCTURES AND A PROFILED BATTEN USED IN SUCH STRUCTURES

Title (en)

CORRUGATED STRUCTURES AND A PROFILED BATTEN USED IN SUCH STRUCTURES

Title (de)

GEWELLTE STRUKTUREN UND PROFILLEISTE FÜR SOLCHE STRUKTUREN

Title (fr)

STRUCTURES ONDULEES ET VOLIGE PROFILEE UTILISEE DANS CELLES-CI

Publication

EP 0797522 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95941111 A

Priority

  • FI 9500697 W
  • FI 946029 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9619379A1] The invention relates mainly to room elements (31) in ship building industry, like various kinds of storage and handling spaces manufactured of corrugated sheet elements. Thanks to the structure of corrugated sheet elements and to the profiled battens (16) invented for joining to each other such corrugated sheet elements, the room elements can be prefabricated and moved onboard the ship as extensively equipped and tested units. They can be tailor-made to fit to the available spaces and they can be joined to room element clusters already at the factory or after they have been moved onboard the ship. They can be fitted in respect to the pillars (5) within the ship so that the pillars are concealed into the corrugation channels of the corrugated sheets, whereby the space onboard the ship can be utilized completely. When joined to each other and/or fastened to surrounding floor, ceiling and/or wall structures, the room elements are well capable to accommodate the forces caused by the motions of the ship. The room elements can be manufactured according to the most stringent hygienic requirements, they can be effectively insulated from each other and they are easy and quick to fabricate and erect.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/60 (2006.01); B63B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 29/025 (2013.01); B63B 3/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9619379 A1 19960627; AU 4262796 A 19960710; DE 69520447 D1 20010426; EP 0797522 A1 19971001; EP 0797522 B1 20010321; FI 101278 B1 19980529; FI 101278 B 19980529; FI 946029 A0 19941222; FI 946029 A 19960623; NO 972917 A 19970808; NO 972917 D0 19970620

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011221

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-06-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520447 20010426

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990615

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970717

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE