Global Patent Index - EP 0797654 B1

EP 0797654 B1 2000-05-03 - LIQUID LAUNDRY DETERGENT

Title (en)

LIQUID LAUNDRY DETERGENT

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGES WASCHMITTEL

Title (fr)

PRODUIT LESSIVIEL LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 0797654 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95907211 A

Priority

US 9414421 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9618713A1] Stable zeolite-containing liquid detergents requiring no viscosity-reducing polymer in order to have a viscosity </= 1000 mPa.s are aqueous surfactant-structured detergents comprising (A) 5-45 % by weight of suspended zeolite particles, (B) 10-30 % by weight of an alkylbenzene sulfonate/nonionic surfactant admixture in which (1) the nonionic component of the admixture is an ethoxylate of an alcohol or an alkylphenol or a mixture thereof with an amine oxide, (2) the alkylbenzene sulfonate/nonionic surfactant weight ratio is in the range of SIMILAR 0.5-10/1, (3) the amine oxide/ethoxylate weight ratio is in the range of 0-4/1, and (4) the amine oxide/alkylbenzene sulfonate weight ratio is in the range of 0-0.5/1, (C) an amount of auxiliary builder in the range of 0.5-4.5 % by weight such that the nonionic surfactant/auxiliary builder weight ratio is not higher than SIMILAR 3.5/1, and (D) 35-80 % by weight of water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C11D 1/83

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/1286 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9618713 A1 19960620; DE 69424319 D1 20000608; DE 69424319 T2 20010523; EP 0797654 A1 19971001; EP 0797654 B1 20000503; JP H10510857 A 19981020

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20020425

2002-10-09 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20020425

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424319 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HU, PATRICK, C.

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIIMATTA, ERIC, W.

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990729

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970708

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT