Global Patent Index - EP 0797696 B2

EP 0797696 B2 2007-10-24 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CELLULOSE FIBRES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CELLULOSE FIBRES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG CELLULOSISCHER FASERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE FIBRES CELLULOSIQUES

Publication

EP 0797696 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 96932374 A

Priority

  • AT 9600188 W
  • AT 170395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2310630A] The invention relates to a process for producing cellulose fibres comprising the steps (A) dissolving a cellulose-containing material in an aqueous tertiary amine oxide to obtain a spinnable cellulose solution; (B) spinning the cellulose solution and taking it through an aqueous precipitation bath, giving water-containing swollen filaments; (C) crushing the water-containing swollen filaments at different points so that there are at least two crushed points per millimetre of filament length, and (D) drying the crushed filaments to obtain cellulose fibres; in which the filaments are crushed under sufficient pressure so that the crushed points also remain on the dried fibre and are visible as colour changes when observed under linearly polarised light.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/00 (2006.01); D02G 3/02 (2006.01); D02J 1/06 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01); D04H 1/42 (2012.01); D04H 1/425 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/00 (2013.01); D04H 1/425 (2013.01); D04H 1/4258 (2013.01); D04H 3/16 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • WO 95124520 A
  • Chemical Fibers International (CFI), Band 45, Februar 1995, Seite 11

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV SI

EPO simple patent family

GB 2310630 A 19970903; GB 2310630 B 19990217; GB 9712422 D0 19970813; AT 169063 T 19980815; AT 402741 B 19970825; AT A170395 A 19961215; AU 705530 B2 19990527; AU 7120596 A 19970507; BG 101688 A 19980331; BG 63643 B1 20020731; BR 9606687 A 19971125; CA 2206250 A1 19970424; CA 2206250 C 20031209; CN 1070543 C 20010905; CN 1173901 A 19980218; CZ 290849 B6 20021016; CZ 9701614 A3 19980617; DE 19680883 D2 19980416; DE 59600380 D1 19980903; DK 0797696 T3 19990503; EP 0797696 A1 19971001; EP 0797696 B1 19980729; EP 0797696 B2 20071024; ES 2120286 T3 19981016; ES 2120286 T5 20080416; GR 3027605 T3 19981130; HK 1009161 A1 20020315; HU 221512 B 20021028; HU 9800831 A2 19980728; HU 9800831 A3 19981228; JP 2007016381 A 20070125; JP 2009013577 A 20090122; JP 2010174429 A 20100812; JP 3884479 B2 20070221; JP 5043144 B2 20121010; JP H10511151 A 19981027; KR 100430921 B1 20040804; MX 9704441 A 19971031; NO 309490 B1 20010205; NO 972440 A 19970528; NO 972440 D0 19970528; PL 188136 B1 20041231; PL 320740 A1 19971027; RO 116653 B1 20010430; RO 120276 B1 20051130; SI 0797696 T1 19981231; SK 284228 B6 20041103; SK 72497 A3 19980114; TR 9700493 T1 19971121; TW 357201 B 19990501; TW 421677 B 20010211; US 6117378 A 20000912; WO 9714829 A1 19970424; ZA 9608515 B 19970520

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161009

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161007

2017-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170126

2016-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 169063 T

- Effective date: 20161008

2016-11-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161007

2016-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-12 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161007

2016-10-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59600380

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070503

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061008

2008-07-18 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2008-04-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2008-03-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2008-02-20 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-12-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-11-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2007-10-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV SI

2007-07-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-06-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070409

2007-04-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070409

2006-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061009

2006-10-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061009

2006-10-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061008

2005-10-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-17 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051013

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-12 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20051012

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LURGI ZIMMER/ALCERU SCHWARZA GMBH

2000-07-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: LURGI ZIMMER/ALCERU SCHWARZA GMBH

- Effective date: 19990427

1999-06-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LURGI ZIMMER/ALCERU SCHWARZA GMBH

- Effective date: 19990427

1999-05-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1999-01-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19981019

1998-11-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19981030

1998-11-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-11-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

1998-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2120286 T3

1998-09-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59600380 19980903

1998-08-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1998-08-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 970702;LT PAYMENT 970702;LV PAYMENT 970702;SI PAYMENT 970702

1998-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 169063 T 19980815

1997-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971014

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970702

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 970702;LT PAYMENT 970702;LV PAYMENT 970702;SI PAYMENT 970702