Global Patent Index - EP 0797718 B1

EP 0797718 B1 2000-04-05 - TEMPORARY DOOR STOP FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR HINGE, AND DEVICE FOR ATTACHING SAME

Title (en)

TEMPORARY DOOR STOP FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR HINGE, AND DEVICE FOR ATTACHING SAME

Title (de)

PROVISORISCHER TÜRANSCHLAG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHARNIER UND VORRICHTUNG UM DIESEN ANZUBRINGEN

Title (fr)

ARRET DE PORTE PROVISOIRE POUR CHARNIERE D'UNE PORTE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN TEL ARRET DE PORTE PROVISOIRE

Publication

EP 0797718 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96934926 A

Priority

  • FR 9601622 W
  • FR 9512129 A
  • FR 9608586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9714864A1] A temporary door stop including a fixed knuckle (2), a movable knuckle (1) and a hinge pin (3) between the two knuckles (1, 2), is disclosed. Said door stop consists of a resilient metal part comprising a substantially rectangular base portion (5) secured to the hinge pin (3) and the movable knuckle (1), and a resilient T-shaped arm (9) with an end portion provided with at least one projection (10, 11) for engaging the fixed knuckle (2) when the door is opened or closed. A device for attaching said temporary door stop is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/04; E05D 5/12; E05D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/04 (2006.01); E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 11/00 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 21/005 (2013.01); E05C 17/045 (2013.01); E05D 5/128 (2013.01); E05D 11/00 (2013.01); E05D 11/1085 (2013.01); E05B 17/0012 (2013.01); E05D 5/121 (2013.01); E05D 5/127 (2013.01); E05D 7/1005 (2013.01); E05D 2005/106 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/218 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/692 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9714864 A1 19970424; AR 004024 A1 19980930; AU 7305696 A 19970507; DE 69607587 D1 20000511; DE 69607587 T2 20000810; EP 0797718 A1 19971001; EP 0797718 B1 20000405; ES 2145488 T3 20000701

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051017

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2004-10-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041007

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145488 T3

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607587 20000511

2000-04-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ARIES INDUSTRIES MECANISMES ET DECOUPAGE FIN

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990301

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970707

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR