Global Patent Index - EP 0797749 B1

EP 0797749 B1 2000-06-14 - SEGMENTED BULKHEAD LINER

Title (en)

SEGMENTED BULKHEAD LINER

Title (de)

GETEILTE SCHUTZPLATTE FÜR DIE STIRNWAND EINER TURBINENBRENNKAMMER

Title (fr)

REVETEMENT SEGMENTE DE CLOISON

Publication

EP 0797749 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95944029 A

Priority

  • US 9515095 W
  • US 35659994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5524438A] Truncated pie shaped bulkhead liner sections 60 are each divided into two liner segments 62. The division occurs adjacent fuel nozzle opening 20. Upstream extending lips 71, 75 and 77 abut the bulkhead 14. Cooling air passes through cooling flow openings in the bulkhead with all the flow continuing toward the shell 38, 40 edges of the liner segments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/10; F23R 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 7/18 (2006.01); F23R 3/10 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/10 (2013.01); F23R 3/283 (2013.01); F23R 3/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5524438 A 19960611; DE 69517537 D1 20000720; DE 69517537 T2 20001019; EP 0797749 A1 19971001; EP 0797749 B1 20000614; JP 3692144 B2 20050907; JP H10510909 A 19981020; WO 9618851 A1 19960620

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141117

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141117

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69517537

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081106

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517537 20000720

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981127

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970715

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB