Global Patent Index - EP 0797941 A3

EP 0797941 A3 2001-01-31 - Table, in particular for office workstations

Title (en)

Table, in particular for office workstations

Title (de)

Tisch, insbesondere für Büroarbeitsplätze

Title (fr)

Table, en particulier pour stations de travail de bureau

Publication

EP 0797941 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97100154 A

Priority

DE 29605407 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0797941A2] The table has a frame consisting of at least two hollow longitudinal struts (1) and two transverse struts (2), with aligned feet (3). The transverse struts have side connecting pins (4) for axial connection to the relevant longitudinal strut via form and/or force locking pressure, shrink fitting and/or adhesive. The connecting pins are ribbed, toothed or have similar unevenness of surface (5). Along the total profile length are surface profilings such as gripping grooves (7) for clipping in sliding connectors, guides and or consoles or support elements (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 17/00; A47B 13/02; A47B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/06 (2006.01); A47B 17/00 (2006.01); A47B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/06 (2013.01); A47B 13/06 (2013.01); A47B 17/003 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29614399 U1 19961121; AT 272960 T 20040815; DE 29605407 U1 19960530; EP 0797941 A2 19971001; EP 0797941 A3 20010131; EP 0797941 B1 20040811

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CEKA-BUROMOBEL WERKE C. KRAUSE UND SOHN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CEKA-BUROMOBEL WERKE C. KRAUSE UND SOHN G.M.B.H. &

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-03-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040811

2005-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711842 P 20040923

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1997-10-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PROBST, HEINZ PETER, C/O CEKA-BUEROMOEBEL WERKE

1997-10-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERFURTH, SIEGFRIED, C/O CEKA-BUEROMOEBEL WERKE

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL