Global Patent Index - EP 0798062 B1

EP 0798062 B1 2001-12-19 - Element made of foamed metal

Title (en)

Element made of foamed metal

Title (de)

Bauteil aus metallischem Schaumwerkstoff

Title (fr)

Elément en mousse métallique

Publication

EP 0798062 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105225 A

Priority

DE 19612781 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798062A2] A metal foam component (1), in the form of a car body element includes a foamed porous layer made up of a metal powder and a foaming agent. The component has at least one contour (1') which is raised out of its plane (1"). The angles in the transition zones of the three-dimensionally formed component lie within the range between 100 and 180 degrees. Also claimed are a method and an apparatus for producing such a component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 7/00; B22F 3/11; B32B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 13/02 (2006.01); B22F 3/11 (2006.01); B22F 5/00 (2006.01); B22F 7/00 (2006.01); B32B 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/1125 (2013.01); B22F 3/1103 (2013.01); B22F 7/006 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49904 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12382 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1241 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12479 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/00 + B22F 7/006
  2. B22F 2998/00 + B22F 3/1125

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19612781 C1 19970821; EP 0798062 A2 19971001; EP 0798062 A3 19981007; EP 0798062 B1 20011219; JP H1058575 A 19980303; US 2001023027 A1 20010920; US 6090232 A 20000718; US 6094798 A 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120327

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120327

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705836

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120327

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110518

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110518

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705836 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991217

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE