Global Patent Index - EP 0798079 B1

EP 0798079 B1 2000-10-18 - Polishing apparatus and polishing method for silicon wafers

Title (en)

Polishing apparatus and polishing method for silicon wafers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Polieren von Halbleiterscheiben

Title (fr)

Machine et procédé de polissage de plaquettes semi-conductrices

Publication

EP 0798079 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97104697 A

Priority

  • JP 6799796 A
  • JP 5450497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798079A2] A polishing apparatus and a polishing method of semiconductor wafers are provided, whereby heavy metal contamination of semiconductor wafers can be prevented effectively in a polishing process. A polishing apparatus of semiconductor wafers including a turn table assembly having a rotatably fixed turn table and a polishing slurry tank for storing polishing slurry to be supplied onto the turn table with a polishing slurry supplying member, wherein the polishing slurry supplying member is provided with means for eliminating heavy metal ions from the polishing slurry. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 55/03; B24B 37/04; C02F 1/42; C02F 1/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 57/00 (2006.01); B24B 55/03 (2006.01); B24B 57/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 55/03 (2013.01); B24B 37/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798079 A2 19971001; EP 0798079 A3 19980325; EP 0798079 B1 20001018; DE 69703312 D1 20001123; DE 69703312 T2 20010222; JP 3384530 B2 20030310; JP H09314466 A 19971209

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-03-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020327

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-03-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703312 20001123

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991203

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB