Global Patent Index - EP 0798130 B1

EP 0798130 B1 2000-06-07 - Lithographic plates with coating

Title (en)

Lithographic plates with coating

Title (de)

Flachdruckplatten mit Beschichtung

Title (fr)

Plaques lithographiques avec revêtement

Publication

EP 0798130 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97200794 A

Priority

  • EP 97200794 A
  • EP 96200865 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798130A1] A lithographic plate support comprises a substrate, e.g. of aluminum, and a coating thereon derived from an aqueous composition comprising a sol, e.g. of a hydrous metal oxide such as zirconia, and a polycarboxy organic polymeric material such as polyacrylic acid and the thickness of said coating is at least 30 nm. Such lithographic supports avoid the need for expensive electrograining and anodising or other surface texturing steps, while nevertheless providing excellent print performance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/036 (2013.01); B41C 1/1016 (2013.01); B41C 2210/02 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/20 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798130 A1 19971001; EP 0798130 B1 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-03-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702223 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981218

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980401

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL