Global Patent Index - EP 0798189 B1

EP 0798189 B1 2001-01-24 - Installation for transporting persons and/or goods

Title (en)

Installation for transporting persons and/or goods

Title (de)

Anlage zum Transport von Personen und bzw. oder von Gütern

Title (fr)

Installation pour transporter des personnes et/ou des marchandises

Publication

EP 0798189 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96890185 A

Priority

AT 55196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798189A1] The system comprises vehicles (10) which travel along a rail track via a permanently moving conveyor cable. The vehicles can be uncoupled from a conveyor cable at stopping points. Deceleration and acceleration wheels (1,2) are provided in the regions of the stopping points, they are fitted to the vehicles, enabling the travel speed to be reduced or increased. The wheels are divided into several groups. The individual wheels within a group are driven with the same peripheral speed and with the transfer of one vehicle from one group to the following group, the wheels of both groups have the same peripheral speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 9/00; B61B 12/10; B61B 12/12; B61B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 9/00 (2006.01); B61B 12/10 (2006.01); B61B 12/12 (2006.01); B61B 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 9/00 (2013.01); B61B 12/105 (2013.01); B61B 12/125 (2013.01); B61B 13/127 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798189 A1 19971001; EP 0798189 B1 20010124; AT 198859 T 20010215; AT 408537 B 20011227; AT A55196 A 20010515; CA 2200832 A1 19970926; CA 2200832 C 20040914; CN 1073962 C 20011031; CN 1165108 A 19971119; DE 59606383 D1 20010301; ES 2154802 T3 20010416; JP H106977 A 19980113; KR 100372790 B1 20030707; US 5893329 A 19990413

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161206

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161204

2017-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 198859 T

- Effective date: 20161205

2016-12-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161204

2016-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-07 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161204

2016-12-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606383

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051205

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154802 T3

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606383 20010301

2001-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-01-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198859 T 20010215

2000-11-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: KARAGHIOSOFF GIORGIO

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981228

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971013

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE