Global Patent Index - EP 0798212 B1

EP 0798212 B1 2000-01-19 - A method for wrapping under tension units of compressible flexible articles

Title (en)

A method for wrapping under tension units of compressible flexible articles

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einwickeln unter Spannung von, aus zusammendrückbaren, nachgiebigen Gegenständen bestehenden, Einheiten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour envelopper sous tension des unités formées d'articles compressible flexibles

Publication

EP 0798212 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96104830 A

Priority

EP 96104830 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798212A1] A process for producing a tension wrapped unit (10) comprising an array (11) of at least 1 substantially parallelepipedal flexible pack (12) wherein a pusher clamp (13) is disposed adjacent side panels (18, 19) and back panel (17) of said array (11), said pusher clamp (13) pushes said array (11) towards a plastic outer packaging material (20) comprising two sheets of film sealed at the centre wherein width dimension of said plastic outer packaging material (20) extends beyond transverse limits of said array (11), said plastic outer packaging material (20) is disposed adjacent front panel (16), top panel (14) and bottom panel (15) of said array (11), said array (11) is subsequently maintained in a fixed position by the action of a pusher plate (23) and by resting on a base plate (22), said pusher clamp (13) retreats and guide rollers (24) ensure said plastic outer packaging material (20) is disposed adjacent said back panel (17), characterised in that said array (11) is compressed in a direction of compression C by means of said pusher clamp (13) and compressed in a direction perpendicular to said direction of compression C by said pusher plate (23), said plastic outer packaging material (20) extending beyond transverse limits of said array (11) is disposed adjacent said remaining side panels (18, 19) of said array (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/02; B65B 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/50 (2006.01); B65B 1/24 (2006.01); B65B 9/02 (2006.01); B65B 13/20 (2006.01); B65B 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 63/02 (2013.01); B65B 9/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798212 A1 19971001; EP 0798212 B1 20000119; AT 188933 T 20000215; AU 2323097 A 19971017; BR 9708748 A 19990803; CA 2250104 A1 19971002; CA 2250104 C 20010918; CN 1218439 A 19990602; DE 69606277 D1 20000224; DE 69606277 T2 20000608; ES 2141992 T3 20000401; GR 3032911 T3 20000731; HK 1003631 A1 20001229; JP H11506998 A 19990622; KR 20000005025 A 20000125; TR 9801912 T2 19990222; WO 9735763 A1 19971002; ZA 9702625 B 19971020

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040329

2005-03-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050327

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040327

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GEVAS VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-04-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040407

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040327

2003-08-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-03-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030318

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030317

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030303

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-10-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-09-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GEVAS VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN GMBH

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2002-03-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-09-05 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GEVAS VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN GMBH

2001-03-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY TRANSFER- GEVAS VERPA

2001-03-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEVAS VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN GMBH

2001-02-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

2001-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20010129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20010124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2141992 T3

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606277 20000224

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188933 T 20000215

1999-09-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990319

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971103

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL