Global Patent Index - EP 0798224 B1

EP 0798224 B1 2000-03-01 - Soft package provided with a suspension device

Title (en)

Soft package provided with a suspension device

Title (de)

Weichpackung mit Aufhängevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Emballage souple pouvu d'un dispositif d'accrochage

Publication

EP 0798224 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400660 A

Priority

FR 9603778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798224A1] The flexible packaging comprises a folded sheet with two surfaces (12,14) either side a bottom fold (16). The two surfaces are joined by their lateral edges (22,24) adjacent to the bottom fold and by a transverse line (28) parallel to the surface edges (30) opposite the bottom fold at a distance (D). A line of least resistance (32) is formed from one of the lateral edges (22) at a distance (d) from the lower surface edge (30). A zone (34) of width (l) remains in which there is no line of least resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/16; B65D 75/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/16 (2006.01); B65D 75/56 (2006.01); B65D 75/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/566 (2013.01); B65D 33/165 (2013.01); B65D 2575/565 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798224 A1 19971001; EP 0798224 B1 20000301; DE 69701333 D1 20000406; DE 69701333 T2 20000713; FR 2746774 A1 19971003; FR 2746774 B1 19980925

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170323

2017-04-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170323

2017-03-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69701333

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701333 20000406

2000-03-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980922

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980401

1998-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORT JAMES FRANCE

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE