Global Patent Index - EP 0798228 B1

EP 0798228 B1 2001-03-28 - Stopper for a container

Title (en)

Stopper for a container

Title (de)

Stopfen für einen Behälter

Title (fr)

Bouchon pour un récipient

Publication

EP 0798228 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105236 A

Priority

CH 81196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798228A1] A stopper for a container, e.g. a small tube or a bottle, comprising (a) a chamber (1) which may be empty or filled with active material(s) (2), e.g. drying agents such as silica gel, active carbon, perfume, or a preservative such as naphthalene, and with an upper edge in the form of a cover part (7) on the other side of the centre line of the stopper and adapted to the shape of chamber (1), preferably a ring-shaped element with a rectangular, square, circular, oval or elliptical cross-section, (b) a sealing or retaining system (3), and optionally (c) a guarantee strip (4) with retainer (5) in the downwards extension (18) of element (7), and/or (d) a compression spring system (6) in the lower part of the stopper and in the downward extension of the side wall (8) of chamber (1). Novel features are that; (i) the lateral outer wall (8a) of chamber (1) forms the sealing/retaining system (3), (ii) the boundary between the inner wall (8b) of chamber (1) and the top (7a) of element (7 ) is designed in such a way that it can be combined with a sealing element (10) matching the size and shape of chamber (1) so that (1) can be sealed from above, either (iii) the lower part of side wall (8) is in the form of a retaining edge (11) facing the centre line which prevents an element (12) inserted into the chamber from above passing this zone and (iv) element (12) consists of a material which retains the active substance (2) in chamber (1) but does not inhibit its action on the other side of (12), or (v) chamber (1) has a base (13) with perforations (14) of the size required to produce the same result as in (iv), and (vi) the space (15) between the side wall (8a) of (1) and the cover part (7) with optional strip (4)/(5) is designed so as to accept and fix the top of the container inserted into this space. Also claimed is a process for the production of this stopper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/30; B65D 51/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/04 (2006.01); B65D 51/26 (2006.01); B65D 51/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/26 (2013.01); B65D 51/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798228 A1 19971001; EP 0798228 B1 20010328; AT 200063 T 20010415; CH 691588 A5 20010831; CZ 290296 B6 20020717; CZ 9700950 A3 19971217; DE 59703211 D1 20010503; DK 0798228 T3 20010618; ES 2108673 T1 19980101; ES 2108673 T3 20010816; GR 3035815 T3 20010731; GR 970300045 T1 19971128; HU 218582 B 20001028; HU 9700665 A2 19971229; HU 9700665 A3 19990301; HU 9700665 D0 19970528; NO 311176 B1 20011022; NO 971452 A 19970929; NO 971452 D0 19970326; PL 182256 B1 20011130; PL 319194 A1 19970929; PT 798228 E 20010928; SI 0798228 T1 20010831

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090327

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090327

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080327

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081002

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080328

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080327

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-11-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080327

2008-10-10 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: .A. *PLASPAQ

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080205

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080207

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070619

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070309

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070109

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-11-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040327

2004-03-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040327

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-03-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-03-27 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020313

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20011213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2108673 T3

2001-08-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 06/2001 PAGE 682: CORR.: PLASPAQ SA

2001-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PLASPAQ SA

2001-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-06-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PLASPAQ SA

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703211 20010503

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO ZINK

2001-04-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: SARNATECH AMMANN S.A. TRANSFER- PLASPAQ SA

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19970327;LT PAYMENT 19970327;LV PAYMENT 19970327;SI PAYMENT 19970327

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200063 T 20010415

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990614

1998-01-09 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1998-01-05 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-01-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2108673 T1

1997-12-17 [IECL] IE: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

1997-11-20 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

1997-11-05 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970506

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 970327;LT PAYMENT 970327;LV PAYMENT 970327;SI PAYMENT 970327