Global Patent Index - EP 0798237 B1

EP 0798237 B1 2000-11-02 - Method of sealing a filling opening of an interchangeable container by a detachable pressing plate, refuse collection vehicle and interchangeable container

Title (en)

Method of sealing a filling opening of an interchangeable container by a detachable pressing plate, refuse collection vehicle and interchangeable container

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Abdichten der Füllöffnung eines Wechselbehälters mittels einer lösbaren Pressplatte, sowie Müllsammelfahrzeug und Wechselbehälter

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fermeture étanche d'une ouverture de remplissage d'un conteneur interchangeable par une plaque de poussée amovible, véhicule de ramassage d'ordures et conteneur interchangeable

Publication

EP 0798237 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97200803 A

Priority

NL 1002723 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798237A1] A method of sealing a filling opening (7) of an interchangeable container (2) situated on a refuse collection vehicle by a detachable pressing plate (17) of a pressing device (5) with the aid of locking means, which pressing device (5) is arranged in a detachable loading device (4) and which pressing device (5) comprises a yoke (8) which is hingeable about a horizontal axis (9) located in the region of the bottom as well as a pressing plate support (12) which is hingeable about a horizontal axis (13) located in the region of the top end of the yoke (8) and to which the detachable pressing plate (17) is fastened, comprises rotating the pressing plate support (12) so far with respect to the yoke (8) that the bottom edge (17') of the pressing plate (17) reaches past the yoke (8) in the direction of the container (2) and thus the pressing plate (17) is positioned in a virtually vertical position in the filling opening (7), and then disconnecting the pressing plate (17) from the support (12) thereof. A refuse collection vehicle and interchangeable container, which are suitable for use in this method, are also disclosed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/14 (2006.01); B65F 3/20 (2006.01); B65F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/143 (2013.01); B65F 3/20 (2013.01); B65F 2003/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798237 A1 19971001; EP 0798237 B1 20001102; AT 197279 T 20001115; DE 69703405 D1 20001207; DE 69703405 T2 20010329; ES 2153156 T3 20010216; NL 1002723 C2 19970930

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040322

2005-03-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050320

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040320

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GEESINK B.V.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-03-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040320

2004-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040320

2003-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030424

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153156 T3

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703405 20001207

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197279 T 20001115

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991215

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971013

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL